This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/08/2021 at 18:52:03 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CREMEN, MARK

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CREMEN, MARK. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CREMEN, MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - SUNTRUST BANK

11/15/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - SUNTRUST BANK

NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT

11/13/2018: NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/26/2018: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/7/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/26/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

12/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

12/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-MARK CREMEN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

7/5/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-MARK CREMEN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/5/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018108449

10/26/2018: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018108449

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/7/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

1/26/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - MARK CREMEN

12/15/2017: DEFAULT - MARK CREMEN

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARK CREMEN

12/14/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARK CREMEN

AFFIDAVIT- INDEBTEDNESS

12/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT- INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS SERVED - MARK CREMEN

7/27/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - MARK CREMEN

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064552

7/5/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064552

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/5/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE - SUNTRUST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SUNTRUST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED-GARNISHMENT-SUNTRUST BANK-MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018108449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARK CREMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARK CREMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-MARK CREMEN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less