This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/04/2023 at 18:02:11 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CAVILEE, MARY L

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAVILEE, MARY L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CAVILEE, MARY L

Venice, FL 34293

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZOGG, ERIK

CLARK, DALTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

12/30/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY L CAVILEE - ISSUED 1/4/2022

12/30/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY L CAVILEE - ISSUED 1/4/2022

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/30/2022: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000519

1/3/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000519

SUMMONS SERVED - MARY L CAVILEE

1/20/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - MARY L CAVILEE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

2/21/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

2/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

NOTICE OF FILING

2/21/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

DEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

2/22/2023: DEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

2/28/2023: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

2/28/2023: AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/28/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023033133)

3/1/2023: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023033133)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023033133)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARY L CAVILEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARY L CAVILEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000519

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY L CAVILEE - ISSUED 1/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less