This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/08/2021 at 18:50:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BROWN, NANCY

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROWN, NANCY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BROWN, NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

GENSMER, TIMOTHY W

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8/27/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - NANCY L BROWN

12/4/2017: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - NANCY L BROWN

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

11/9/2017: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

11/9/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

11/9/2017: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/8/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

8/8/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - NANCY BROWN

7/31/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - NANCY BROWN

SUMMONS SERVED - NANCY BROWN

7/17/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - NANCY BROWN

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064568

7/5/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064568

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NANCY BROWN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

7/5/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NANCY BROWN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/5/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

7/5/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - NANCY L BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT - NANCY BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - NANCY BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017064568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NANCY BROWN - ISSUED 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less