This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 22:34:34 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ADAMS, DEBRA S

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADAMS, DEBRA S. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ADAMS, DEBRA S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, NATAIJA

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION - OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

7/10/2019: SATISFACTION - OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

3/15/2019: NOTICE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019022994

3/4/2019: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019022994

WRIT PROPOSED

3/4/2019: WRIT PROPOSED

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2018158230)

12/5/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2018158230)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/21/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

11/21/2018: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - DEBRA S ADAMS

9/11/2018: DEFAULT - DEBRA S ADAMS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/3/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - DEBI ADAMS

7/26/2019: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - DEBI ADAMS

CERTIFICATE - DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

3/18/2019: CERTIFICATE - DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE ATTORNEY FEE DEMAND - BANK OF AMERICA NA

3/13/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE ATTORNEY FEE DEMAND - BANK OF AMERICA NA

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

12/5/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

9/7/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEBRA S ADAMS

9/7/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEBRA S ADAMS

SUMMONS SERVED - DEBRA S ADAMS

7/19/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - DEBRA S ADAMS

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DEBRA S ADAMS- ISSUED 7/3/2018

7/3/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DEBRA S ADAMS- ISSUED 7/3/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

7/3/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - DEBI ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION - OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - OF GARNISHMENT - RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROMSWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE ATTORNEY FEE DEMAND - BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED-GARNISHMENT- BANK OF MAERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION-MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEBRA S ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DEBRA S ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018068155

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DEBRA S ADAMS- ISSUED 7/3/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less