This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/20/2021 at 20:36:17 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK, SIMENSKY, STEPHEN L Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 DISCOVER BANK, SIMENSKY, STEPHEN L was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. and MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SIMENSKY, STEPHEN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINNS, AARON

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020003685)

1/7/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020003685)

MOTION- FINAL JUDGMENT

1/2/2020: MOTION- FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/2/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERTIFICATE- PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

1/2/2020: CERTIFICATE- PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

DEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

7/15/2019: DEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

7/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

7/12/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/12/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

7/12/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

AFFIDAVIT OF KRISTOFER KASSON

7/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF KRISTOFER KASSON

SUMMONS SERVED - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

4/26/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019035106

4/5/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019035106

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-STEPHEN L SIMENSKY - ISSUED 04/05/2019

4/5/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-STEPHEN L SIMENSKY - ISSUED 04/05/2019

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/5/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

4/5/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020003685)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF KRISTOFER KASSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - STEPHEN L SIMENSKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019035106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-STEPHEN L SIMENSKY - ISSUED 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less