This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/20/2021 at 23:39:12 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK, KLEBBA, ANEILIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 DISCOVER BANK, KLEBBA, ANEILIA was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. and MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KLEBBA, ANEILIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINNS, AARON

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020026963)

2/25/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020026963)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

2/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

2/18/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/18/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

8/8/2019: DEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

8/7/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

8/7/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/7/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

8/7/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

SUMMONS SERVED - ANEILIA KLEBBA

4/25/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ANEILIA KLEBBA

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019037518

4/12/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019037518

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANEILIA KLEBRA- ISSUED 04/12/2019

4/12/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANEILIA KLEBRA- ISSUED 04/12/2019

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

4/12/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2020026963)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - ANEILIA KLEBBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ANEILIA KLEBBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019037518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANEILIA KLEBRA- ISSUED 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less