This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 21:01:30 (UTC).

DIEHL, JUDITH O, DIEHL, JUDITH O Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 DIEHL, JUDITH O, DIEHL, JUDITH O was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Trustees and Petitioners

FISHMAN, WENDY

DIEHL, JUDITH O

Not Yet Classified

THE EDWARD A OCHEN TRUST U/A DATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REILLY, PATRICK

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CONSBRUCK, PAUL JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Apr 11 2022 10:30AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/30/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN ZOOM , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022022055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPETITION - FOR APPROVAL OF TRUST ACCOUNTING PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION AND RELEASE AND DISCHARGE OF TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edwards is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL JOSEPH CONSBRUCK