This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 00:49:40 (UTC).

DECKER, DAVID M VS SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 DECKER, DAVID M filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DECKER, DAVID M

Defendant

SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LESSINGER, JASON ALAN

 

Court Documents

UMC/EX-PARTE RECORDING SHEET

1/24/2018: UMC/EX-PARTE RECORDING SHEET

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES-SECOND NOTICE

12/8/2017: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES-SECOND NOTICE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/13/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/6/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/16/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

5/16/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017032478

4/3/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017032478

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

4/3/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4/3/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/26/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018009946)

1/24/2018: ORDER - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018009946)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/24/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/29/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

11/29/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

MOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT

11/2/2017: MOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/16/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT

4/21/2017: DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT

SUMMONS SERVED- RETURN OF SERVICE

4/17/2017: SUMMONS SERVED- RETURN OF SERVICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018009946)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUMC/EX-PARTE RECORDING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES-SECOND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/13/2017 AT 9:45 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: JUN 6 2017 1:30PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017032478

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-SARASOTA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/16/2017 AT 9:45 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less