This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 18:03:45 (UTC).

CUPOLA HOMES27 LLC VS LIDINSKY, CHRIS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 CUPOLA HOMES27 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LIDINSKY, CHRIS. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUPOLA HOMES27 LLC

Defendant

LIDINSKY, CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIS, MICHAEL

SIEGEL, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/16/2023: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRIS LIDINSKY - ISSUED 1/24/2023

1/16/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRIS LIDINSKY - ISSUED 1/24/2023

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004884

1/17/2023: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004884

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

2/14/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

2/14/2023: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - CHRIS LIDINSKY

2/14/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - CHRIS LIDINSKY

AFFIDAVIT - VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

2/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT - VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

2/15/2023: DEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023031337)

2/24/2023: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023031337)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023034986)

3/2/2023: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023034986)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

3/8/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

WRIT PROPOSED

3/8/2023: WRIT PROPOSED

WRIT ISSUED

3/9/2023: WRIT ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023034986)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023031337)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CHRIS LIDINSKY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHRIS LIDINSKY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004884

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRIS LIDINSKY - ISSUED 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less