This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/24/2023 at 18:04:41 (UTC).

CUMISKEY, WILLIAM T VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 CUMISKEY, WILLIAM T filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BREWER, DANIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BREWER, DANIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUMISKEY, WILLIAM T

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEMPLETON, LOGAN

Defendant Attorney

LAURENCEAU, HANS

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSIVE - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

4/19/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSIVE - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

4/19/2023: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

4/19/2023: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

ORDER - REJECTING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

4/17/2023: ORDER - REJECTING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

ORDER - AGREED - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

3/31/2023: ORDER - AGREED - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

3/30/2023: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

3/16/2023: NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

3/10/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

3/5/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: JURY TRIAL - CIVIL SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2024
  • HearingTime: 08:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2024
  • HearingTime: 09:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES SOUTH COUNTY - CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSIVE - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketJURY TRIAL - CIVIL SC SET FOR 08/19/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN D , JDG: BREWER, DANIELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketSET FOR 08/19/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN D , JDG: BREWER, DANIELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 08/09/2024 AT 8:45 AM IN D , JDG: BREWER, DANIELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023017169

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - ISSUED 2/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less