This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 20:45:32 (UTC).

CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION Et Al VS ESQUEDA, RODOLFO

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ESQUEDA, RODOLFO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORTH OKALOOSA MEDICAL

CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION

Defendant

ESQUEDA, RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

3/29/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

SUBPOENA - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

2/7/2019: SUBPOENA - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/11/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ANTHONY J STEELE

6/11/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ANTHONY J STEELE

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018077781)

6/11/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018077781)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/21/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

5/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT

5/21/2018: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT

DEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

2/16/2018: DEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY SERVICE - PROPER VENUE

2/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY SERVICE - PROPER VENUE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

2/15/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

SUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

1/23/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017115013

12/11/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017115013

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RODOLFO ESQUEDA - ISSUED 12/11/2017

12/8/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RODOLFO ESQUEDA - ISSUED 12/11/2017

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

12/8/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/8/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ANTHONY J STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018077781)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY SERVICE - PROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RODOLFO ESQUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017115013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RODOLFO ESQUEDA - ISSUED 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less