This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/06/2021 at 23:23:35 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS SIMMONS, LAURA E

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIMMONS, LAURA E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

SIMMONS, LAURA E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST - JUDICIAL REVIEW

6/10/2019: REQUEST - JUDICIAL REVIEW

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

6/3/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - VENICE HMA LLC

2/8/2018: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - VENICE HMA LLC

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

2/5/2018: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

WRIT RETURNED - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT - SERVED - VENICE HMA LLC

1/12/2018: WRIT RETURNED - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT - SERVED - VENICE HMA LLC

NOTICE - RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY

1/10/2018: NOTICE - RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY

WRIT PROPOSED - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

1/3/2018: WRIT PROPOSED - CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/16/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

3/1/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SATISFACTION - FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

3/28/2019: SATISFACTION - FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FOR TIME EMPLOYED - Recorded (OR. / 2018036289)

3/21/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FOR TIME EMPLOYED - Recorded (OR. / 2018036289)

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

3/9/2018: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF EXTENSION

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF EXTENSION

ORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING

1/8/2018: ORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING

REQUEST - JUDICIAL REVIEW

1/8/2018: REQUEST - JUDICIAL REVIEW

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

1/3/2018: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST & COSTS

9/1/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST & COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/16/2017: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - PUNTA GORDA HMA, LLC C/O CORPORATTION SERVICE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED-CONTINUING GARNISHMENT- PUNTA GORDA HMA LCC-MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON WRIT - CONTINUING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - JUDICIAL REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketACTION: FWD WRIT AND TRANSMITTAL LETTER TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 12 2017 2:30PM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT - LAURA SIMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LAURA E SIMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$480.00; Amount Paid:$480.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017021338

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LAURA E SIMMONS-ISSUED 03/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less