This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 13:20:26 (UTC).

COZZOLINO, SANDRA K VS LOVELY, JOHN JAMES

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 COZZOLINO, SANDRA K filed an Other lawsuit against LOVELY, JOHN JAMES. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COZZOLINO, SANDRA K

Respondent

LOVELY, JOHN JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketREPORT -STATE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketACTION: FORWARDED COPIES OF VIOLATION AND FINAL JUDGMENT TO STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION - SERVED - JOHN JAMES LOVELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketACTION: COPY OF REQUEST TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR A COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketACTION: - SERVICE PACKET TO SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION - SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less