This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 15:27:30 (UTC).

CORDELL, GERALD VS GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 CORDELL, GERALD filed an Other lawsuit against GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA, WALKER, STEPHEN and CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORDELL, GERALD

Defendants

WINN-DIXIE STORES INC

GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS, DAVID HUGHES

Defendant Attorneys

TOPKIN, SANFORD ROY

MCKEON, CHARLES EDWARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/16/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT - A

10/15/2020: EXHIBIT - A

STIPULATION - JOINT ALLOWING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

10/14/2020: STIPULATION - JOINT ALLOWING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPLY

9/9/2020: NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPLY

AFFIDAVIT - SERVICE

7/6/2020: AFFIDAVIT - SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY

6/22/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/6/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

4/1/2020: NOTICE - OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/15/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

EXHIBIT A

12/21/2020: EXHIBIT A

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

9/10/2020: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

EXHIBIT "A"

8/14/2020: EXHIBIT "A"

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

8/13/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FO PRODUCTION

6/22/2020: RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FO PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

6/16/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-CLAIM

4/7/2020: MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-CLAIM

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - SAMSON MERGER SUB LLC WINN-DIXIE STORES INC

3/9/2020: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - SAMSON MERGER SUB LLC WINN-DIXIE STORES INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/25/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ORDER COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON MOTION COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER - GATE KEEPER SYSTEMS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA DECES TECUM DIRECTED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER - GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS' INC MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM DIRECTED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC - ISSUED 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHONE CONVERSATION RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$440.00; Amount Paid:$440.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019124821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WINN-DIXIE STORES INC - ISSUED 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC - 12/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GATEKEEPER SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Winn Dixie Stores Inc is a litigant