This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/19/2020 at 12:14:51 (UTC).

COOPEY, MARY VS BURKHART, EDWARD WAYNE

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 COOPEY, MARY filed an Other lawsuit against BURKHART, EDWARD WAYNE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPEY, MARY

Defendants

BURKHART, EDWARD WAYNE

LIDY, EMILY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEMMA, CATHERINE DOUGLAS

MACK-MAJKA, JACQULYN

Defendant Attorneys

LIPPERT, JENNIE

GARRIOTT, EMILY

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/7/2019: RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

7/22/2019: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

RESPONSE- REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

4/22/2019: RESPONSE- REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

COMPLAINT - AMENDED/SECOND AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/21/2019: COMPLAINT - AMENDED/SECOND AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER - ON JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2/27/2019: ORDER - ON JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

STIPULATION - TRANSFER CASE TO SOUTH COUNTY DIVISION

2/19/2019: STIPULATION - TRANSFER CASE TO SOUTH COUNTY DIVISION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018109890

10/31/2018: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018109890

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART - 10/31/2018

10/31/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART - 10/31/2018

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/23/2019: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - ON ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS - MOTIONS DIRECTED TO THE PLEADINGS AND ANY OTHER MOTIONS STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES

9/12/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - ON ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS - MOTIONS DIRECTED TO THE PLEADINGS AND ANY OTHER MOTIONS STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

7/29/2019: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - EMILY MARIE LIDY

3/28/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - EMILY MARIE LIDY

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019017557

2/19/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019017557

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

1/28/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

1/28/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS - FOR DEFENDANT EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

11/30/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS - FOR DEFENDANT EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - AMENDED - EMILY MARIE LIDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - PLAINTIFF - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION DOCUMENT NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST-COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN J , JDG: RUHL, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE - SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT - EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS - FOR DEFENDANT EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$440.00; Amount Paid:$440.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018109890

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- EDWARD WAYNE BURKHART - 10/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less