This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/20/2021 at 04:32:14 (UTC).

CONDOMINIUM ON THE BAY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION INC, DASHER, MYRA S Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 CONDOMINIUM ON THE BAY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION INC, DASHER, MYRA S was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DASHER, MYRA S

Defendant

CONDOMINIUM ON THE BAY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUTZ, H

Defendant Attorney

COOPER, ALAN

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8/20/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/19/2019: MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER (1) DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE PENDING SETTLEMENT; (2) CANCELLING HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL; AND (3) DIRECTING THE FILING OF STATUS REPORTS

12/3/2019: ORDER (1) DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE PENDING SETTLEMENT; (2) CANCELLING HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL; AND (3) DIRECTING THE FILING OF STATUS REPORTS

REQUEST - FOR COPIES

11/15/2019: REQUEST - FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/13/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - MEDIATION

10/9/2019: NOTICE - MEDIATION

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/20/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE - COMPLIANCE WITH MEDIATION DISCLOSURE

10/21/2019: NOTICE - COMPLIANCE WITH MEDIATION DISCLOSURE

NOTICE - SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

10/4/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - LAW FIRM NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL ;Court Result:Cancelled Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING ;Court Result:Cancelled Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (1) DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE PENDING SETTLEMENT; (2) CANCELLING HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL; AND (3) DIRECTING THE FILING OF STATUS REPORTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE - OF SETTLEMENT PROPOSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - IN LIMINE - DEFENDANT'S - PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL BILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 07/16/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN 7C , JDG: RUHL, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CONDOMINIUM ON THE BAY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019017511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALAN COOPER