This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/23/2022 at 18:34:08 (UTC).

COLON, FERNANDO VS COLE, ANNETTE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 COLON, FERNANDO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against COLE, ANNETTE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLON, FERNANDO

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

COLE, ANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHUCRI, PATRICK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANNETTE COLE - ISSUED 11/29/2022

11/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANNETTE COLE - ISSUED 11/29/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

11/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/28/2022: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/28/2022: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105059

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105059

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/5/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

12/7/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/17/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022105059

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANNETTE COLE - ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK CHUCRI, ESQ