This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/15/2021 at 20:55:56 (UTC).

COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC VS THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/02/2018 COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC

Defendant

THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENTINE, THOMAS C

 

Court Documents

GARNISHMENT NOTICE

11/6/2018: GARNISHMENT NOTICE

WRIT RETURNED SERVED

11/5/2018: WRIT RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - REGIONS BANK

11/5/2018: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - REGIONS BANK

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018106017

10/19/2018: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018106017

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFAULT -- THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

8/20/2018: DEFAULT -- THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

8/17/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

8/7/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC - ISSUED 07/02/2018

7/2/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC - ISSUED 07/02/2018

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

11/14/2018: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/7/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT

11/1/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT

WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

10/19/2018: WRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

10/19/2018: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2018129898)

10/1/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2018129898)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/1/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018067602

7/2/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018067602

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/2/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGARNISHMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE - REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED-GARNISHMENT- REGIONS BANK-MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018106017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED - GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 1 2018 9:30AM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT -- THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018067602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE MEADOWS AT CYPRESS GARDENS LLC - ISSUED 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less