This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/14/2021 at 03:42:17 (UTC).

COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC VS ASFUR JR, DAVID L Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASFUR JR, DAVID L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTIONS OF SARASOTA INC

Defendants

DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

ASFUR JR, DAVID L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENTINE, THOMAS C

 

Court Documents

ORDER - TO AMEND CASE STYLE

5/2/2018: ORDER - TO AMEND CASE STYLE

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058365)

5/2/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058365)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/2/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID L ASFUR JR AND DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

3/23/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID L ASFUR JR AND DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID L ASFUR JR

3/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID L ASFUR JR

SUMMONS SERVED - DJR CONSTRCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

3/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - DJR CONSTRCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JOSEPH M RODRIGUES - ISSUED 02/20/2018

2/19/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JOSEPH M RODRIGUES - ISSUED 02/20/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/19/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/19/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - JOSEPH M RODRIGUES

5/2/2018: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - JOSEPH M RODRIGUES

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

4/17/2018: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOSEPH M. RODRIGUEZ

4/3/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOSEPH M. RODRIGUEZ

DEFAULT - DAVID L ASFUR JR AND DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

3/26/2018: DEFAULT - DAVID L ASFUR JR AND DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2018017224

2/20/2018: PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2018017224

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGMENT LLC - ISSUED 02/20/2018

2/19/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGMENT LLC - ISSUED 02/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DAVID L ASFUR JR - ISSUED 02/20/2018

2/19/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DAVID L ASFUR JR - ISSUED 02/20/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TO AMEND CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058365)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - JOSEPH M RODRIGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 2 2018 2:00PM JUDGE: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - JOSEPH M. RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID L ASFUR JR AND DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DAVID L ASFUR JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DJR CONSTRCTION MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$330.00; Amount Paid:$330.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2018017224

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DJR CONSTRUCTION MANAGMENT LLC - ISSUED 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JOSEPH M RODRIGUES - ISSUED 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DAVID L ASFUR JR - ISSUED 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less