This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 16:38:27 (UTC).

COLE, LUDY DELCARMEN VS JERNIGAN JR, ROSS RALPH

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 COLE, LUDY DELCARMEN filed an Other lawsuit against JERNIGAN JR, ROSS RALPH. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLE, LUDY DELCARMEN

Defendant

JERNIGAN JR, ROSS RALPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER, NICOLE

COHEN, LEE GILL

Defendant Attorneys

DUPUY, TYLER

WOOLAM, KRISTIN HELLER

WOOLAM, KRISTIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION- FROM NON PARTY

12/18/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION- FROM NON PARTY

ADDRESS CHANGE - FIRM

11/18/2019: ADDRESS CHANGE - FIRM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

6/20/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

SUBPOENA

3/25/2019: SUBPOENA

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST - COPIES

9/20/2018: REQUEST - COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018046257

5/3/2018: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018046257

NOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED EXCEPTIONS TO RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE

2/6/2020: NOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED EXCEPTIONS TO RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE

RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO SEE PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT

1/22/2020: RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO SEE PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

3/25/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

3/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2/22/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - DEPOSITION

1/14/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/6/2018: CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE- OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GI

5/3/2018: NOTICE- OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GI

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 26 2020 9:30AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR TRANSCRIPT AND HEARING ON EXCEPTIONS TO RECOMMENDED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED EXCEPTIONS TO RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - EXCEPTIONS TO RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER - ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO SEE PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 17 2020 11:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018046257

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION- VIDEO DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROSS RALPH JERNIGAN JR - SUMMONS NOT ISSUED - INCORRECT NAME OF CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less