This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/25/2023 at 03:28:42 (UTC).

COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC VS JOSERA LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSERA LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC

Defendants

PORT CHARLOTTE FACILITY OPERATIONS LLC

LV CHC HOLDINGS I LLC

JOSERA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILDRETH, MARK

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY, JOHN

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/22/2022: RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/28/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO REASSIGN

11/14/2022: RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO REASSIGN

MOTION - TO RE-ASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

11/11/2022: MOTION - TO RE-ASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LV CHC HOLDINGS I LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

6/20/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LV CHC HOLDINGS I LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSERA LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

6/20/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSERA LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PORT CHARLOTTE FACILITY OPERATIONS LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

6/20/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PORT CHARLOTTE FACILITY OPERATIONS LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

ORDER

1/11/2023: ORDER

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

12/30/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

MOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

12/15/2022: MOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/12/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

RECOMMENDED ORDER

12/8/2022: RECOMMENDED ORDER

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

11/30/2022: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TO PLAINTIFF

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

11/30/2022: NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 01/23/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 8 2022 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 8 2022 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022054926

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSERA LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LV CHC HOLDINGS I LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PORT CHARLOTTE FACILITY OPERATIONS LLC - ISSUED 6/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less