This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/23/2023 at 01:38:08 (UTC).

COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC VS 1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COASTAL CARE STAFFING LLC

Defendants

1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC

EPSILON HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES LLC

NSPIRE HEALTHCARE

NSPRMC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILDRETH, MARK

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY, JOHN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - 1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC, EPSILON HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES LLC, AND NXPRMCLLC

8/1/2022: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - 1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC, EPSILON HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES LLC, AND NXPRMCLLC

SUMMONS RETURNED - EPSILON HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES, LLC

7/29/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED - EPSILON HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES, LLC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/28/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2022: NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - MOTION TO REASSIGN

11/14/2022: RESPONSE - MOTION TO REASSIGN

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/22/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

2/2/2023: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER - CANCELLING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT

1/11/2023: ORDER - CANCELLING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/9/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

12/30/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

MOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

12/15/2022: MOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/12/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

RECOMMENDED ORDER

12/8/2022: RECOMMENDED ORDER

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

11/30/2022: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/21/2023 AT 10:45 AM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CANCELLING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO DIVISION C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO AMEND ANSWER TO WITHDRAW AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THREE AND FOUR AND CORRECT NUMBERED RESPONSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 01/23/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022055391

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -NSPRMC LLC DBA NSPIRE HEALTHCARE - ISSUED 6/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS - PARTY NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT - EPSILON HEALTH CARE PROPERTIES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-1111 DRURY LANE OPERATIONS LLC - ISSUED 6/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less