Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 19:22:09 (UTC).

CLARK, COURTNEY VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 CLARK, COURTNEY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARROLL, HUNTER W and MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARROLL, HUNTER W

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, COURTNEY

Defendants

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

USAA INSURANCE AGENCY INC OF TEXAS

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VAKA, GEORGE

MOORE, GEOFFREY

HUBBARD, ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

GUBERNAT, JESSE

GOODEN, KANSAS

COLLINS, ANDREW

VAN DER LINDE, KRISTEN MARIE

KIDD, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

11/28/2018: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018143609)

10/31/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018143609)

RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

10/23/2018: RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF JOHN R CASSIDY MD AUGUST 14, 2018

8/15/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF JOHN R CASSIDY MD AUGUST 14, 2018

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

8/8/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/18/2018: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-TIMOTHY CLAUSSEN

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-TIMOTHY CLAUSSEN

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR COPIES

4/11/2018: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR COPIES

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017065463

7/7/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017065463

NOTICE - OF SUPPLEMENTARY AUTHORITY

6/15/2020: NOTICE - OF SUPPLEMENTARY AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

6/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/15/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

4/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

COMPLAINT-AMENDED - FOURTH

3/23/2020: COMPLAINT-AMENDED - FOURTH

NOTICE OF FILING - AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AMENDED RESPONSE

3/5/2020: NOTICE OF FILING - AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AMENDED RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/17/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

EVIDENCE RECORD #42205 - JOINT

8/24/2018: EVIDENCE RECORD #42205 - JOINT

231 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ROBERT C HUBBARD, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING IN PART/DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingTime:11:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 7 2020 11:15AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - AMENDED - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
280 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - USAA INSURANCE AGENCY INC OF TEXAS- ISSUED 5/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 5/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - USAA INSURANCE AGENCY INC OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$3,044.00; Amount Paid:$3,044.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2017017308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - USAA INSURANCE AGENCY INC OF TEXAS - ISSUED 02/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 02/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Insurance Agency of Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW COLLINS