This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/19/2020 at 00:45:32 (UTC).

CITY OF SARASOTA, JILL SKINNER AS PARENT AND NATURAL LEGAL GUARDIAN OF FAITH SKINNER A MINOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 CITY OF SARASOTA, JILL SKINNER AS PARENT AND NATURAL LEGAL GUARDIAN OF FAITH SKINNER A MINOR was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JILL SKINNER AS PARENT AND NATURAL LEGAL GUARDIAN OF FAITH SKINNER A MINOR

SKINNER, JILL

Defendant

CITY OF SARASOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARBOWSKI, KRISTIN

Defendant Attorney

MLADINICH, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

1/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

1/23/2020: NOTICE - OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/23/2020: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - FIRST

8/23/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE - FIRST

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/23/2019: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/21/2019: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/21/2019: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER - AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CITY OF SARASOTA

6/7/2019: ANSWER - AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CITY OF SARASOTA

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019035810

4/8/2019: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019035810

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

4/8/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

4/8/2019: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/8/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

4/8/2019: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CITY OF SARASOTA - ISSUED 4/8/2019

4/8/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CITY OF SARASOTA - ISSUED 4/8/2019

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/8/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CITY OF SARASOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019035810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CITY OF SARASOTA - ISSUED 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less