Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/14/2021 at 18:17:17 (UTC).

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA VS HATEFI, YELENA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HATEFI, YELENA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA

Defendant

HATEFI, YELENA

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT - MAIL RETURN - YELENA HATEFI

1/26/2021: RECEIPT - MAIL RETURN - YELENA HATEFI

RECEIPT - CERTIFED MAIL - YELENA HATEFI

1/19/2021: RECEIPT - CERTIFED MAIL - YELENA HATEFI

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021006326)

1/13/2021: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021006326)

PAYMENT $399.11 RECEIPT #2021003142

1/13/2021: PAYMENT $399.11 RECEIPT #2021003142

NOTICE OF RECORDING- (CERTIFIED MAIL # 7018 0360 0001 4935 5211)

1/13/2021: NOTICE OF RECORDING- (CERTIFIED MAIL # 7018 0360 0001 4935 5211)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - MAIL RETURN - YELENA HATEFI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - CERTIFED MAIL - YELENA HATEFI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$399.11; Amount Paid:$399.11; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021006326)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $399.11 RECEIPT #2021003142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING- (CERTIFIED MAIL # 7018 0360 0001 4935 5211)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant