This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 14:00:37 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS VOGT, JEFFREY C

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 CITIBANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VOGT, JEFFREY C. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARROLL, HUNTER W, WALKER, STEPHEN and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARROLL, HUNTER W

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

VOGT, JEFFREY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

MOTION - FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

1/19/2021: MOTION - FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/19/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

3/13/2020: MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/25/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/25/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

2/25/2020: NOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

2/12/2020: NOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS SERVED - JEFFREY C VOGT

2/11/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - JEFFREY C VOGT

ANSWER - COMPLAINT - JEFFERY C VOGT

1/17/2020: ANSWER - COMPLAINT - JEFFERY C VOGT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019123201

12/11/2019: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019123201

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JEFFREY C VOGT - ISSUED 12/11/2019

12/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JEFFREY C VOGT - ISSUED 12/11/2019

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/10/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT

12/10/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/10/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JEFFREY C VOGT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - COMPLAINT - JEFFERY C VOGT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019123201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JEFFREY C VOGT - ISSUED 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel