This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/20/2021 at 05:08:08 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA, HANDLEY, DAVID N Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 CITIBANK NA, HANDLEY, DAVID N was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

HANDLEY, DAVID N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/12/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020158188)

11/9/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020158188)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

11/5/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/4/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERTIFICATE - PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

11/4/2020: CERTIFICATE - PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

11/4/2020: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

11/4/2020: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/4/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

DEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

4/28/2020: DEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

4/27/2020: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

4/27/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

AFFIDAVIT - OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

4/27/2020: AFFIDAVIT - OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID N HANDLEY

4/24/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID N HANDLEY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019018174

2/20/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019018174

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID N HANDLEY - ISSUED 02/20/2019

2/20/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID N HANDLEY - ISSUED 02/20/2019

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/20/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/20/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/20/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020158188)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - DAVID N HANDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DAVID N HANDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019018174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID N HANDLEY - ISSUED 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less