Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 12:46:32 (UTC).

CIT BANK, N.A. VS ALLEN, DAVID ALBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 CIT BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALLEN, DAVID ALBERT. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIT BANK, N.A.

Defendants

PRISCILLA D WOOD AKA PRISCILLA DIANE GEIGER

ALLEN, DAVID ALBERT

SOLSBARY, ROBERT

MCGUIRE, MARGARET ANN

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBURY AKA LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBARY DECEASED

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DAVIS, CHRISTINE DURAND

SARASOTA HARBOUR APARTMENTS INC

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF VIOLET D ALLEN DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

GUGINO, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

BID SHEET

10/13/2017: BID SHEET

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

9/29/2017: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

NOTICE OF ACTION

3/29/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/27/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

2/23/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PAYMENT $1,995.00 RECEIPT #2017010415

2/1/2017: PAYMENT $1,995.00 RECEIPT #2017010415

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT SOLSBARY - ISSUED 02/01/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT SOLSBARY - ISSUED 02/01/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRISTINE DURAND DAVIS - ISSUED 02/01/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRISTINE DURAND DAVIS - ISSUED 02/01/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

10/13/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

6/19/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, SARASOTA HARBOUR APARTMENTS INC AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5/2/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, SARASOTA HARBOUR APARTMENTS INC AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY

3/27/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS SERVED - SARSOTA HARBOUR APARTMENTS INC

2/17/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - SARSOTA HARBOUR APARTMENTS INC

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

2/9/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBURY AKA LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBARY DECEASED ET AL - ISSUED 02/01/2017

1/31/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBURY AKA LOUISE CORINNE SOLSBARY DECEASED ET AL - ISSUED 02/01/2017

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

1/31/2017: NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017131253)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR SALE ON 10/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2017091510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE SALE - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT SOLSBARY - ISSUED 02/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PRISCILLA D WOOD AKA PRISCILLA DIANE GEIGER - ISSUED 02/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARGARET ANN MCGUIRE - ISSUED 02/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID ALBERT ALLEN - ISSUED 02/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRISTINE DURAND DAVIS - ISSUED 02/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012864)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUGINO, JOSEPH