Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/07/2021 at 12:18:56 (UTC).

CIT BANK N A VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 CIT BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT S WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIT BANK N A

Defendants

NATHANIEL A BUSTEED AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOINT SELF DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 15 2005

BUSTEED, NATHANIEL A

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARYOF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE JOINT SELF-DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 15, 2005

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLES, ANDREA

Defendant Attorneys

BOLVES, ERIC LEONARD

RUDY, JOHN FORNEY III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

2/5/2018: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

NOTICE FOR TRIAL - RENEWED FOR NON-JURY TRIAL

11/20/2017: NOTICE FOR TRIAL - RENEWED FOR NON-JURY TRIAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/13/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CERTIFICATE TITLE - PROPOSED

10/31/2017: CERTIFICATE TITLE - PROPOSED

DEFAULT - THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE JOINT SELF-DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 15, 2005

7/11/2017: DEFAULT - THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE JOINT SELF-DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 15, 2005

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

5/15/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

3/17/2017: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

1/31/2017: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012502)

1/31/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012502)

BID SHEET

3/22/2018: BID SHEET

PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018029050

3/20/2018: PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018029050

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

2/5/2018: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

FORECLOSURE - FINAL JUDGMENT PROPOSED

2/5/2018: FORECLOSURE - FINAL JUDGMENT PROPOSED

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

10/31/2017: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

5/23/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

SUMMONS SERVED-SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC-CORPORATE SERVICE

3/3/2017: SUMMONS SERVED-SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC-CORPORATE SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018042330)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018029050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #2018018802

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017012502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- NATHANIEL A BUSTEED - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE JOINT SELF DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 15, 2005 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- NATHANIEL A BUSTEED AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOINT SELF DECLARATION OF TRUST AGREEMENTDATED MARCH 15, 2005 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTY #1 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTY #2 - ISSUED 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORRENTO EAST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BELHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant