This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 17:32:36 (UTC).

CIG FINANCIAL LLC VS FRERE, JEREMIAH

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CIG FINANCIAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRERE, JEREMIAH. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIG FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

FRERE, JEREMIAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021079704

9/17/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021079704

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/16/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JEREMIAK FRERE

9/16/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JEREMIAK FRERE

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

9/16/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021079704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JEREMIAK FRERE - ISSUED 9/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIG Financial, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L