This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/22/2022 at 18:17:39 (UTC).

CHARLOTTE STATE BANK AND TRUST VS CYPRESS FALLS AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 CHARLOTTE STATE BANK AND TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CYPRESS FALLS AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLOTTE STATE BANK AND TRUST

Defendants

RACHEL SAXON FERRY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTITIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ERIC S SAXON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIC C SAXON

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SAXON FERRY, RACHEL

SAXON, CHRISTIAN

SAXON PRICE, SHANNON

SAXON, RYAN

SAXON, THOMAS G

SAXON, STEPHEN C

CYPRESS FALLS AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

THE WOODLANDS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIC S SAXON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STURGES, ERNEST WILLIAM JR

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $17.50 RECEIPT #2021072283

8/25/2021: PAYMENT $17.50 RECEIPT #2021072283

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

8/18/2021: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RELEASE LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2021152181)

8/17/2021: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RELEASE LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2021152181)

PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2021064301

7/29/2021: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2021064301

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

7/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #2021063879

7/28/2021: PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #2021063879

NOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN-NOT UPDATED PER ADMNISTRATIVE ORDER 2016-16.2

7/27/2021: NOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN-NOT UPDATED PER ADMNISTRATIVE ORDER 2016-16.2

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021139232)

7/27/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021139232)

CERTIFICATE - POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

7/27/2021: CERTIFICATE - POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

7/27/2021: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $17.50 RECEIPT #2021072283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RELEASE LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2021152181)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2021064301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RYAN SAXON - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIC S SAXON - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHANNON SAXON PRICE - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE WOODLANDS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 7/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THOMAS G SAXON - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STEPHEN C SAXON - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CYPRESS FALLS AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHRISTIAN SAXON - ISSUED 7/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$1,012.50; Amount Paid:$1,012.50; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #2021063879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN-NOT UPDATED PER ADMNISTRATIVE ORDER 2016-16.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021139232)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CYPRESS FALLS AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WOODLANDS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STURGES, ERNEST WILLIAM JR