This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 19:27:10 (UTC).

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY Et Al VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVI

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVI. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

SPRING, ARTHUR J

UNKNOWN PARTY # 3

SPRING, MARGARET F

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN PARTY # 4

SPRING, JUSTIN DOYLE

PELICAN COVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST JUSTIN M SPRING DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOW PARTY # 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWOSINSKI, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorneys

LUBBECKE, CARMEN

COHEN, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

10/30/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

NOTICE OF SALE

10/16/2019: NOTICE OF SALE

JUDGMENT - FORECLOSURE - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019098117)

7/18/2019: JUDGMENT - FORECLOSURE - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019098117)

NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE AND LOAN AGREEMENT

7/18/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE AND LOAN AGREEMENT

LIST - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

5/10/2019: LIST - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

2/21/2019: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

SUMMONS SERVED - PELICAN COVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATES INC

10/2/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - PELICAN COVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATES INC

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #2

10/1/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #2

SUMMONS SERVED - MARGARET F SPRING

10/1/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - MARGARET F SPRING

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

10/30/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3/27/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - DENYING MOTION DISMISS

12/12/2018: ORDER - DENYING MOTION DISMISS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/12/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

10/1/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

RESPONSE - TO THE SPRINGS' MOTION TO DISMISS

8/24/2018: RESPONSE - TO THE SPRINGS' MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JUSTIN DOYLE SPRING-ISSUED 06/01/2018

6/1/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JUSTIN DOYLE SPRING-ISSUED 06/01/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOW HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST JUSTIN M SPRING DECEASED-ISSUED 06/01/2018

6/1/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOW HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST JUSTIN M SPRING DECEASED-ISSUED 06/01/2018

NOTICE- VALUE

6/1/2018: NOTICE- VALUE

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019162743)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019110025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT-ISSUED 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOW HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST JUSTIN M SPRING DECEASED-ISSUED 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 2-ISSUED 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 1-ISSUED 06/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018073190)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less