This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/30/2022 at 18:13:05 (UTC).

CENTEX HOMES Et Al VS AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2022 CENTEX HOMES filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

CENTEX HOMES

DIVSOTA HOMES, L.P.

Defendants

RAYMOND BUILDING SUPPLY CORPORATION

RICHARD & RICE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOULTIONS INC

YODER CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC

AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERISURE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

CLEAR BLUE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

KNIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBUGH PA

PENNSYLVANIA LUMBERMENS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, ELLEN

Defendant Attorneys

OHLENSCHLAEGER, KYLE

LOREN, BRUCE E

STEIN FULTON, WENDY

COBA, KATHERINE

MAZA, JORGE

Other Attorneys

OBRIEN, NEIL

BAHADORAN, SINA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OF UNAVALABILITY

11/30/2022: NOTICE - OF UNAVALABILITY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPAY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/22/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPAY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS SERVED - SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/22/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS SERVED - PENNSYLVANIA LUMBERMENS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/22/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - PENNSYLVANIA LUMBERMENS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JEFFREY L CHEATHAM

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JEFFREY L CHEATHAM

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - LEINAALA SALLANDER

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - LEINAALA SALLANDER

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - CHRISTOPHER BURKETT

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - CHRISTOPHER BURKETT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RACHEL BOGART

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RACHEL BOGART

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JUSTIN BOGART

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JUSTIN BOGART

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - ALEKXA ASHER

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - ALEKXA ASHER

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RICHARD ASHER

9/30/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RICHARD ASHER

COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVALABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPAY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PENNSYLVANIA LUMBERMENS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - DORIS CECILIA ESQUIAQUI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JEFFREY L CHEATHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - LEINAALA SALLANDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - CHRISTOPHER BURKETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RACHEL BOGART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - JUSTIN BOGART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - ALEKXA ASHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - ISSUED - 10/01/2022 - RICHARD ASHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raymond Building Supply Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA LUMBERMANS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant