This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/06/2022 at 18:33:51 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ZAMORA, ALFREDO

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZAMORA, ALFREDO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ZAMORA, ALFREDO

Sarasota, FL 34232

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILUIKO, OLEKSANDRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

5/13/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

5/13/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022043409

5/13/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022043409

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ALFREDO ZAMORA

5/31/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ALFREDO ZAMORA

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ALFREDO ZAMORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/21/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022043409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - ALFREDO ZAMORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA