This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:33:55 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS TAYLOR, ZEIDA M

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TAYLOR, ZEIDA M. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

TAYLOR, ZEIDA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNO, BRYAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND AMENDED EMAIL DESIGNATION

9/21/2019: NOTICE - CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND AMENDED EMAIL DESIGNATION

JUDGMENT - SUMMARY - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019106580)

8/5/2019: JUDGMENT - SUMMARY - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019106580)

AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

7/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/22/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/30/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/17/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/17/2018: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

RESPONSE

11/13/2018: RESPONSE

SUMMONS SERVED - ZEIDA M TAYLOR

10/23/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - ZEIDA M TAYLOR

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018102671

10/10/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018102671

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ZEIDA M TAYLOR - ISSUED 10/10/2018

10/9/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ZEIDA M TAYLOR - ISSUED 10/10/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

10/9/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/9/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND AMENDED EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - SUMMARY - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019106580)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • HearingTime:03:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 22 2019 3:00PM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 22 2019 3:00PM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: 7B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 5 2019 11:30AM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: 7B

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 5 2019 11:30AM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ZEIDA M TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018102671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ZEIDA M TAYLOR - ISSUED 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less