This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 18:31:34 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS CORY, KYRA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORY, KYRA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

CORY, KYRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KYRA CORY

7/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KYRA CORY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054590

7/10/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054590

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - KYRA CORY

7/10/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - KYRA CORY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

7/10/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KYRA CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/11/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - KYRA CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less