This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 18:04:59 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ANDRADE, ISRAEL FERRAZ DE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDRADE, ISRAEL FERRAZ DE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ANDRADE, ISRAEL FERRAZ DE

Sarasota, FL 34232

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS, BREANNA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

1/21/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/21/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/21/2022: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

1/21/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022006286

1/21/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022006286

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

1/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

SUMMONS SERVED - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

2/4/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- AMENDED

2/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- AMENDED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3/1/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

3/2/2022: ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

3/2/2022: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

LIST - EXHIBIT

3/10/2022: LIST - EXHIBIT

LIST - WITNESS

3/10/2022: LIST - WITNESS

MOTION - ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

3/11/2022: MOTION - ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingTime:03:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 28 2022 3:30PM JUDGE: DENKIN, DAVID LEE LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS ;Court Result:CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ISRAEL FERRAZ DE ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 03/01/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022006286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS , BREANNA