This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 18:30:25 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ALBERT, COURTNEY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBERT, COURTNEY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ALBERT, COURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, DERYL

Defendant Attorney

SHILLING, CODY

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

7/28/2020: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/28/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

7/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS SERVED- COURTNEY ALBERT

7/17/2020: SUMMONS SERVED- COURTNEY ALBERT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054468

7/10/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054468

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COURTNEY ALBERT

7/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COURTNEY ALBERT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/9/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

7/9/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - COURTNEY ALBERT

7/9/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - COURTNEY ALBERT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/9/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 09/22/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- COURTNEY ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020054468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COURTNEY ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/28/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - COURTNEY ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less