This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 01:12:42 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS ADAMO, CIRO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADAMO, CIRO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ADAMO, CIRO

Sarasota, FL 34240-7088

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

1/12/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CIRO ADAMO

1/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CIRO ADAMO

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003699

1/12/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003699

SUMMONS NON SERVED - CIRO ADAMO

1/26/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - CIRO ADAMO

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/31/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - CIRO ADAMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003699

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CIRO ADAMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/31/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: COUNTY CIVIL C AND D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less