This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 18:34:55 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

8/28/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

8/28/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/28/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

8/28/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023083008

8/28/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023083008

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

9/19/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023083008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 08/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less