This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/08/2023 at 18:07:09 (UTC).

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA Et Al VS TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 08/09/2023 AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLUMAGE, ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

HENRY, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/9/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/9/2023: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/9/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/9/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

8/9/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

8/9/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

8/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023076695

8/9/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023076695

SUMMONS SERVED - TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

8/14/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

8/17/2023: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

APPEARANCE RECORD DISMISSAL RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023137279)

9/5/2023: APPEARANCE RECORD DISMISSAL RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023137279)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/5/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/5/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/5/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/5/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - VACATE DISMISSAL

9/18/2023: MOTION - VACATE DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - VACATE DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD DISMISSAL RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023137279)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
08/09/2023

FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023076695

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 09/05/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less