This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/06/2023 at 18:38:32 (UTC).

SURF CONSULTANTS II INC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO UNITED TRANZACTIONS LLC LANSING BUILDING PRODUCTS VS ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 SURF CONSULTANTS II INC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO UNITED TRANZACTIONS LLC LANSING BUILDING PRODUCTS filed an Other lawsuit against ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is UZABEL, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

UZABEL, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SURF CONSULTANTS II INC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO UNITED TRANZACTIONS LLC LANSING BUILDING PRODUCTS

Defendant

ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER, STACEY SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/12/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/12/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC

9/12/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

9/12/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023087930

9/13/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023087930

STIPULATION - OF SETTLEMENT

9/26/2023: STIPULATION - OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

10/4/2023: ORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$15,000<=$30,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023087930

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ABOVE ALL ALUMINUM LLC - ISSUED - 9/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less