This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/09/2023 at 18:06:24 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOMPOTHECRAS, ALEX

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

4/10/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

4/10/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/10/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/10/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/10/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

4/10/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023035239

4/10/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023035239

SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

4/18/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

4/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

RESPONSE - FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/4/2023: RESPONSE - FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

5/8/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

5/8/2023: NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

RESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

5/8/2023: RESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVICE FIRST INTERROGATORIES

5/23/2023: NOTICE - SERVICE FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

5/23/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

5/23/2023: REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

5/25/2023: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023035239

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 4/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less