This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/18/2023 at 18:04:19 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC VS CASAMER, RANDALL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASAMER, RANDALL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is UZABEL, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

UZABEL, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

Defendant

CASAMER, RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

Defendant Attorney

HEINTZ, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

5/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

5/19/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- RANDALL CASAMER

5/19/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- RANDALL CASAMER

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023049454

5/19/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023049454

SUMMONS SERVED - RANDALL CASAMER

6/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - RANDALL CASAMER

ORDER - OF DEFAULT

6/22/2023: ORDER - OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

7/3/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/3/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION - VACATE DEFAULT

7/3/2023: MOTION - VACATE DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - VACATE DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RANDALL CASAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023049454

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- RANDALL CASAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 06/21/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less