This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/26/2023 at 18:10:54 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorneys

INSKO, ELIZABETH

PIOMELLI, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

8/28/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

8/28/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/28/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/28/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/28/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

8/28/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023083084

8/28/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023083084

NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS

9/28/2023: NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER - GEICO

10/5/2023: ANSWER - GEICO

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/5/2023: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER - GEICO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023083084

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 08/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less