This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/16/2023 at 18:31:43 (UTC).

MALINOWSKI, DOUGLAS Et Al VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 MALINOWSKI, DOUGLAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALINOWSKI, DOUGLAS

MEDARIS, ELIZABETH

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CREMEENS, PATRICK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

9/22/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FCA US LLC

9/22/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FCA US LLC

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/22/2023: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023092112

9/26/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023092112

SUMMONS SERVED - FCA US LIC

9/29/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - FCA US LIC

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS SERVED - FCA US LIC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023092112

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$30,000<=$50,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FCA US LLC - ISSUED 9/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less