This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/21/2023 at 18:33:57 (UTC).

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MORTON SIEGEL VS ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2023 CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MORTON SIEGEL filed an Other lawsuit against ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MORTON SIEGEL

Defendants

ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, TYLER

Defendant Attorneys

GEORGE, DAWN

REYES, ANA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/27/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

9/27/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

9/27/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023092631

9/27/2023: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023092631

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10/3/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/3/2023: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/3/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/3/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS SERVED - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - CORPORATE SERVICE

10/5/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - CORPORATE SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC

10/9/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

02/20/2024

HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - CORPORATE SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/20/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023092631

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ADVANCED MANAGEMENT OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARGUS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC - ISSUED 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less