This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/28/2023 at 02:58:42 (UTC).

KELMAR REALTY HOLDINGS LLC VS HOLCOMB ENERGY SYSTEMS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 KELMAR REALTY HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOLCOMB ENERGY SYSTEMS LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELMAR REALTY HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

HOLCOMB ENERGY SYSTEMS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOUTHWELL, J STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

MCKAY, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

6/9/2023: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

6/8/2023: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

COMPLAINT - COUNTER

6/8/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTER

MOTION - DETERMINE RENT

6/7/2023: MOTION - DETERMINE RENT

MOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

6/7/2023: MOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023053339

6/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023053339

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

5/31/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

COMPLAINT

5/31/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER - GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO UPDATE CASE MANAGEMENT SYTEM

9/27/2023: ORDER - GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO UPDATE CASE MANAGEMENT SYTEM

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

9/27/2023: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/27/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/26/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

9/26/2023: MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION - TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

9/5/2023: MOTION - TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

ORDER - ADOPTING AND APPROVING RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE REGARDING MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

8/31/2023: ORDER - ADOPTING AND APPROVING RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE REGARDING MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

MOTION - DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/25/2023: MOTION - DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO UPDATE CASE MANAGEMENT SYTEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - ADOPTING AND APPROVING RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE REGARDING MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DETERMINE RENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023053339

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HOLCOMB ENERGY SYSTEMS LLC ISSUED 06/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less