This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/06/2023 at 18:04:06 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorney

CONNER, WADE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED SERVICES INSURANCE COMPANY

5/8/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED SERVICES INSURANCE COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

5/8/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/8/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/8/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/8/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

5/8/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023045066

5/8/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023045066

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

5/24/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/28/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023045066

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED SERVICES INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 5/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less