This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/14/2023 at 01:04:44 (UTC).

BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FELIX, RYAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FELIX, RYAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorney

WEAVER, KYLIE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- PRE TRIAL SUMMONS REQUIRED

4/14/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- PRE TRIAL SUMMONS REQUIRED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4/14/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/14/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/14/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/14/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

4/14/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

4/14/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037249

4/14/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037249

SUMMONS SERVED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

4/18/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

4/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION - DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

5/2/2023: MOTION - DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

MOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

5/2/2023: MOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/2/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/26/2023: OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

5/26/2023: OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037249

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/02/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: COUNTY CIVIL C AND D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- PRE TRIAL SUMMONS REQUIRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less